SD HB1008 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Delivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State H.J. 806
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Restrict access to certain restrooms and locker rooms in public schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restrict access to certain restrooms and locker rooms in public schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-03 - House - House Veto override (Y: 36 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07SenateDelivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State H.J. 806
2016-03-03SenateVeto override, Failed, YEAS 36, NAYS 29. H.J. 775
2016-03-02SenateVetoed by the Governor H.J. 748
2016-02-23SenateDelivered to the Governor H.J. 650
2016-02-22SenateSigned by President S.J. 398
2016-02-17SenateSigned by Speaker H.J. 427
2016-02-16SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 20, NAYS 15. S.J. 311
2016-02-11SenateEducation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 291
2016-02-11SenateScheduled for hearing
2016-01-28SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 167
2016-01-27HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 10. H.J. 203
2016-01-27HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 202 Amendment 1008cb
2016-01-25HouseState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 158
2016-01-25HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1008ca
2016-01-25HouseScheduled for hearing
2016-01-13HouseReferred to House State Affairs H.J. 35
2016-01-12HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 16

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1008&Session=2016
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2016/Bills/HB1008P.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2016/Bills/HB1008HST.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2016/Bills/HB1008H.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2016/Bills/HB1008ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=20228&Session=2016
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=20336&Session=2016
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=20884&Session=2016
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=20953&Session=2016
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=21825&Session=2016

Bill Comments

feedback