SD HB1007 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Signed by the Governor on February 27, 2024 H.J. 410
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amend the requirement to employ a county veterans' service officer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amend the requirement to employ a county veterans' service officer.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2024-02-15 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-27HouseSigned by the Governor on February 27, 2024 H.J. 410
2024-02-22HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 22, 2024 H.J. 372
2024-02-21SenateSigned by the President S.J. 380
2024-02-20HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 362
2024-02-15SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 346
2024-02-13SenateMilitary and Veterans Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0.
2024-02-13SenateScheduled for hearing
2024-01-30SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Military and Veterans Affairs S.J. 203
2024-01-29HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 188
2024-01-24HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2024-01-24HouseMilitary and Veterans Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
2024-01-24HouseScheduled for hearing
2024-01-09HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Military and Veterans Affairs H.J. 21

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback