SD HB1007 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 530
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding checks or bid bonds for public improvements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding checks or bid bonds for public improvements.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09HouseSigned by the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 530
2021-03-03HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 03, 2021 H.J. 481
2021-03-02SenateSigned by the President S.J. 384
2021-03-01HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 435
2021-02-25SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 351
2021-02-24SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2021-02-24SenateLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
2021-02-24SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 102
2021-01-22HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 110
2021-01-21HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2021-01-21HouseLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0.
2021-01-21HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-12HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 14

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback