SD HB1007 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-08 - Signed by Governor H.J. 664
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-08 - Signed by Governor H.J. 664
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the South Dakota Building Authority to issue revenue bonds to provide for maintenance and repair on facilities controlled by the Board of Regents and to provide appropriations therefor.
Title
Authorize the South Dakota Building Authority to issue revenue bonds to provide for maintenance and repair on facilities controlled by the Board of Regents and to provide appropriations therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | Signed by Governor H.J. 664 | |
2011-03-03 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 620 | |
2011-03-02 | Signed by President S.J. 599 | |
2011-03-01 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 585 | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 561 | |
2011-02-25 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 542 | |
2011-02-24 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 518 | |
2011-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-01 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 279 | |
2011-01-31 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 3. H.J. 236 | |
2011-01-27 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. H.J. 190 | |
2011-01-27 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-11 | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 22 |