SD HB1005 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 6, 2017 H.J. 682
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 6, 2017 H.J. 682
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require the Government Operations and Audit Committee to provide oversight to the Board of Regents on issues relating to the university centers.
Title
Require the Government Operations and Audit Committee to provide oversight to the Board of Regents on issues relating to the university centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 6, 2017 H.J. 682 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 02, 2017 H.J. 675 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 608 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 582 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 575 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 552 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 254 |
2017-01-31 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 235 |
2017-01-26 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 218 |
2017-01-25 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 203 |
2017-01-23 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 158 |
2017-01-23 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1005ma |
2017-01-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to House State Affairs, Passed H.J. 51 |
2017-01-10 | House | First read in House and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 18 |