SD HB1005 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-23 - Signed by Governor H.J. 488
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-23 - Signed by Governor H.J. 488
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions pertaining to private shooting preserves.
Title
Revise certain provisions pertaining to private shooting preserves.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | Signed by Governor H.J. 488 | |
2011-02-17 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 454 | |
2011-02-16 | Signed by President S.J. 457 | |
2011-02-15 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 404 | |
2011-02-14 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 415 | |
2011-02-10 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-02-10 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 396 | |
2011-02-02 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 295 | |
2011-02-01 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 1. H.J. 251 | |
2011-01-27 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 191 | |
2011-01-27 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1005tb | |
2011-01-27 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1005ta | |
2011-01-27 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-11 | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 22 |