SD HB1001 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-10 - Signed by the Governor on November 10, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-10 - Signed by the Governor on November 10, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the decennial redistricting of the Legislature.
Title
Provide for the decennial redistricting of the Legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-10 - House - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 37 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - Joint - Motion to amend (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - Senate - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Motion to amend (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - House - Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - House - Do Pass (Y: 48 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - House - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - Joint - Motion to amend (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - Senate - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Motion to amend (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - House - Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - House - Do Pass (Y: 48 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - House - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-10 | House | Signed by the Governor on November 10, 2021 |
2021-11-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on November 10, 2021 H.J. 53 |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 95 |
2021-11-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 53 |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 2. S.J. 94 |
2021-11-10 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 37, NAYS 31. H.J. 52 |
2021-11-10 | House | Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. Amendment 1001D |
2021-11-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-11-08 | House | Conference Committee appointments |
2021-11-10 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 14 |
2021-11-08 | House | House of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 11 |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 9. |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 8. Amendment 1001B |
2021-11-10 | Senate | First Reading Senate S.J. 33 |
2021-11-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 48, NAYS 20. H.J. 9 |
2021-11-08 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. |
2021-11-08 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 8 |