SD HB1001 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - State Affairs Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - State Affairs Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal certain provisions regarding the organization of the Legislature.
Title
Repeal certain provisions regarding the organization of the Legislature.
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Haugaard [R] | Rep. Spencer Gosch [R] | Rep. Randy Gross [R] | Rep. Chris Johnson [R] |
Rep. John Mills [R] | Rep. Sue Lucas-Peterson [R] | Rep. Lee Qualm [R] | Rep. Jamie Smith [D] |
Sen. Brock Greenfield [R] | Sen. Jim Bolin [R] | Sen. Bob Ewing [R] | Sen. Troy Heinert [D] |
Sen. Kris Langer [R] | Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] | Sen. Jim White [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Tabled (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 42 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 42 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | State Affairs Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 355 |
2020-01-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 42, NAYS 26. H.J. 68 |
2020-01-24 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. |
2020-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 19 |
2020-01-14 | House | First Reading House H.J. 11 |