SD HB1001 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2019 H.J. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2019 H.J. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the timing of the recalculation of the allocations for the disability levels in the state aid to special education formula.
Title
Revise the timing of the recalculation of the allocations for the disability levels in the state aid to special education formula.
Sponsors
Rep. Hugh Bartels [R] | Sen. Mary Duvall [R] | Sen. Kyle Schoenfish [R] | Rep. Jamie Smith [D] |
Sen. Reynold Nesiba [D] | Sen. Jim Bolin [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. Jeff Monroe [R] |
Sen. Jordan Youngberg [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2019 H.J. 694 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 05, 2019 H.J. 626 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 600 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 593 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 540 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 517 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-17 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 122 |
2019-01-16 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 132 |
2019-01-16 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 131 Amendment 1001cb |
2019-01-14 | House | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. H.J. 44 |
2019-01-14 | House | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1001ca |
2019-01-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-08 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 16 |