SD HB1001 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-25 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 14, NAYS 18. S.J. 255
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-25 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 14, NAYS 18. S.J. 255
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the membership of the Executive Board of the Legislative Research Council.
Title
Revise the membership of the Executive Board of the Legislative Research Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 14, NAYS 18. S.J. 255 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 1. S.J. 220 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-17 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 119 |
2018-01-16 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 66 |
2018-01-12 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-01-12 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 54 |
2018-01-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-09 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 17 |