SD HB1001 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - Signed by Governor H.J. 542
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - Signed by Governor H.J. 542
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the sales and use tax.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the sales and use tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | Signed by Governor H.J. 542 | |
2012-02-14 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 476 | |
2012-02-13 | Signed by President S.J. 400 | |
2012-02-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 423 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 339 | |
2012-02-08 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-02-08 | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 311 | |
2012-02-08 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 135 | |
2012-01-20 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 73 | |
2012-01-19 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-01-19 | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 51 | |
2012-01-19 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-10 | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 15 |