SD HB1001 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 528
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 528
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions concerning the assessment of agricultural land.
Title
Revise certain provisions concerning the assessment of agricultural land.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-25 | Signed by Governor H.J. 528 | |
2011-02-23 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 505 | |
2011-02-22 | Signed by President S.J. 491 | |
2011-02-17 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 455 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 9. S.J. 455 | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 433 | |
2011-02-10 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-02-10 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 396 | |
2011-02-03 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 318 | |
2011-02-02 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 2. H.J. 267 | |
2011-02-01 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 242 | |
2011-02-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-11 | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 21 |