SD HB1001 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - Signed by Governor H.J. 850
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - Signed by Governor H.J. 850
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow municipalities and counties to issue certain special alcoholic beverage licenses and to repeal certain special alcoholic beverage licenses.
Title
Allow municipalities and counties to issue certain special alcoholic beverage licenses and to repeal certain special alcoholic beverage licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Commerce Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Commerce Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-12 | Signed by Governor H.J. 850 | |
2010-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 800 | |
2010-03-09 | Signed by President S.J. 622 | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 755 | |
2010-03-04 | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 2. H.J. 697 | |
2010-03-02 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 528 | |
2010-02-25 | Commerce Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 475 | |
2010-02-25 | Commerce Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1001ja | |
2010-02-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-23 | Deferred by Chair | |
2010-02-23 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-28 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce S.J. 172 | |
2010-01-27 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 3. H.J. 201 | |
2010-01-22 | Commerce Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 166 | |
2010-01-22 | Commerce Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1001sa | |
2010-01-22 | Commerce Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1001fd | |
2010-01-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-12 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce H.J. 18 |