SC S790 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-29 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-15
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-29 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-15
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND CHAPTER 3, TITLE 16 OF THE 1976 CODE, BY ADDING ARTICLE 19 TO ESTABLISH A PROCEDURE FOR THE ISSUANCE OF TEMPORARY AND PERMANENT CIVIL NO-CONTACT ORDERS UNDER CERTAIN CIRCUMSTANCES, TO PROVIDE FOR THE DURATION OF CIVIL NO-CONTACT ORDERS, TO PROVIDE NECESSARY DEFINITIONS, TO PROVIDE A PENALTY FOR THE VIOLATION OF CIVIL NO-CONTACT ORDERS, TO PROVIDE FOR THE ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN PROTECTION ORDERS, AND TO PROVIDE FOR THE REQUIREMENTS FOR VALID FOREIGN PROTECTION ORDERS.
Title
By Adding Article 19 To Establish A Procedure For The Issuance Of Temporary And Permanent Civil No-contact Orders Under Certain Circumstances, To Provide For The Duration Of Civil No-contact Orders, To Provide Necessary Definitions, To Provide A Penalty For The Violation Of Civil No-contact Orders, To Provide For The Enforcement Of Foreign Protection Orders, And To Provide For The Requirements For Valid Foreign Protection Orders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-15 | |
2010-04-29 | Introduced and read first time HJ-15 | |
2010-04-28 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-32 | |
2010-04-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-04-27 | Read second time SJ-22 | |
2010-04-27 | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted SJ-22 | |
2010-04-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-04-22 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary SJ-10 | |
2009-05-13 | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Rose, Shoopman | |
2009-05-06 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-4 | |
2009-05-06 | Introduced and read first time SJ-4 |
Same As/Similar To
H3031 (Similar To) 2009-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-27
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=0790&session=118 |