SC S718 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-09 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-64
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-09 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-64
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND SECTION 22-3-550 OF THE 1976 CODE, RELATING TO ORDERING RESTITUTION IN MAGISTRATE’S COURT, TO PROVIDE THAT A MAGISTRATE HAS JURISDICTION OF ALL OFFENSES WHICH MAY BE SUBJECT TO THE PENALTIES OF A FINE OR FORFEITURE NOT EXCEEDING ONE THOUSAND DOLLARS AND TO PROVIDE THAT A MAGISTRATE MAY ORDER RESTITUTION IN AN AMOUNT NOT TO EXCEED THE CIVIL JURISDICTIONAL AMOUNT FOR MAGISTRATES.
Title
Relating To Ordering Restitution In Magistrate’s Court, To Provide That A Magistrate Has Jurisdiction Of All Offenses Which May Be Subject To The Penalties Of A Fine Or Forfeiture Not Exceeding One Thousand Dollars And To Provide That A Magistrate May Order Restitution In An Amount Not To Exceed The Civil Jurisdictional Amount For Magistrates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-64 | |
2010-03-09 | Introduced and read first time HJ-64 | |
2010-03-09 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-18 | |
2010-03-04 | Read second time SJ-14 | |
2010-03-04 | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted SJ-14 | |
2010-03-03 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary SJ-8 | |
2009-04-16 | Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Ford, Massey, S.Martin, Mulvaney | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-5 | |
2009-04-15 | Introduced and read first time SJ-5 |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=718&session=118 |