SC S707 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-14 - Introduced and adopted SJ-13
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-14 - Introduced and adopted SJ-13
Summary
A SENATE RESOLUTION TO RECOGNIZE AND HONOR THE MOST REVEREND ROBERT E. GUGLIELMONE UPON THE OCCASION OF HIS ORDINATION AND INSTALLATION AS THE THIRTEENTH BISHOP OF THE DIOCESE OF CHARLESTON ON MARCH 25, 2009, AND TO WELCOME HIM TO THE STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA.
Title
A Senate Resolution To Recognize And Honor The Most Reverend Robert E. Guglielmone Upon The Occasion Of His Ordination And Installation As The Thirteenth Bishop Of The Diocese Of Charleston On March 25, 2009, And To Welcome Him To The State Of South Carolina.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-14 | Introduced and adopted SJ-13 |
Same As/Similar To
H3869 (Similar To) 2009-04-02 - Introduced and adopted HJ-29
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=0707&session=118 |