SC S692 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 340
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 340
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE REQUIRING ALL CIRCUIT SOLICITORS TO HAVE A TRAFFIC EDUCATION PROGRAM IN EFFECT FROM JULY 1, 2009, AS PROVIDED IN ACT 176 OF 2008, TO JULY 1, 2011. - ratified title
Title
Extend The Deadline Requiring All Circuit Solicitors To Have A Traffic Education Program In Effect From July 1, 2009, As Provided In Act 176 Of 2008, To July 1, 2011. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
Sen. Creighton Coleman [D] | Sen. Bradley Hutto [D] | Sen. John Knotts [R] | Sen. Glenn McConnell [R] |
Sen. John Scott [D] | Sen. Vincent Sheheen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-09 | Act No. 340 | |
2010-07-01 | Effective date 06/11/10 | |
2010-06-11 | Signed By Governor | |
2010-06-07 | Ratified R 301 | |
2010-06-01 | Roll call Yeas-95 Nays-0 HJ-90 | |
2010-06-01 | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled HJ-90 | |
2010-05-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-05-26 | Returned to House with amendments SJ-97 | |
2010-05-26 | House amendment amended SJ-97 | |
2010-05-21 | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments HJ-3 | |
2010-05-20 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day HJ-24 | |
2010-05-20 | Read second time HJ-23 | |
2010-05-20 | Amended HJ-23 | |
2010-05-12 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary HJ-10 | |
2009-04-22 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-66 | |
2009-04-22 | Introduced and read first time HJ-66 | |
2009-04-22 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-17 | |
2009-04-21 | Read second time SJ-21 | |
2009-04-16 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2009-04-15 | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary | |
2009-04-15 | Polled out of committee Judiciary | |
2009-04-14 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-8 | |
2009-04-14 | Introduced and read first time SJ-8 |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=692&session=118 |