SC S616 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-25 - Referred to Committee on Finance SJ-4
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Status: Introduced on March 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-25 - Referred to Committee on Finance SJ-4
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND SECTION 9-11-25, AS AMENDED, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO THE OPTION ALLOWED PROBATE JUDGES TO PARTICIPATE IN THE SOUTH CAROLINA POLICE OFFICERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM (SCPORS), SO AS TO EXTEND THIS OPTION TO ASSISTANT SOLICITORS EMPLOYED BEFORE JULY 1, 2010, AND TO REQUIRE ALL ASSISTANT SOLICITORS HIRED AFTER JUNE 30, 2010, TO PARTICIPATE IN SCPORS, TO REQUIRE THAT EMPLOYER CONTRIBUTIONS FOR ASSISTANT SOLICITORS PARTICIPATING IN SCPORS IN EXCESS OF THE EMPLOYER CONTRIBUTIONS THAT ARE REQUIRED FOR THEIR PARTICIPATION IN THE SOUTH CAROLINA RETIREMENT SYSTEM MUST BE PAID FROM STATE FUNDS APPROPRIATED FOR THE OPERATIONS OF THE OFFICE IN WHICH THE ASSISTANT SOLICITOR SERVES, AND TO CLARIFY A REFERENCE.
Title
Extend This Option To Assistant Solicitors Employed Before July 1, 2010, And To Require All Assistant Solicitors Hired After June 30, 2010, To Participate In Scpors, To Require That Employer Contributions For Assistant Solicitors Participating In Scpors In Excess Of The Employer Contributions That Are Required For Their Participation In The South Carolina Retirement System Must Be Paid From State Funds Appropriated For The Operations Of The Office In Which The Assistant Solicitor Serves, And To Clarify A Reference.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-25 | Referred to Committee on Finance SJ-4 | |
2009-03-25 | Introduced and read first time SJ-4 |
Same As/Similar To
H3734 (Similar To) 2009-03-24 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means HJ-16
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=0616&session=118 |