SC S329 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-15 - Act No. 203
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-15 - Act No. 203
Summary
AN ACT TO AMEND THE CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, BY ADDING SECTION 24-3-580 SO AS TO PROHIBIT THE DISCLOSURE UNDER CERTAIN CIRCUMSTANCES OF THE IDENTITY OF MEMBERS OF AN EXECUTION TEAM AND TO ALLOW FOR CIVIL PENALTIES FOR A VIOLATION OF THE SECTION, AND BY ADDING SECTION 24-3-590 SO AS TO PROHIBIT LICENSING AGENCIES FROM TAKING ANY ACTION TO REVOKE, SUSPEND, OR DENY A LICENSE TO ANY PERSON SOLELY FOR HIS PARTICIPATION ON AN EXECUTION TEAM. - ratified title
Title
Prohibit Licensing Agencies From Taking Any Action To Revoke, Suspend, Or Deny A License To Any Person Solely For His Participation On An Execution Team. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-15 | Act No. 203 | |
2010-06-11 | Effective date 06/07/10 | |
2010-06-07 | Signed By Governor | |
2010-06-01 | Ratified R 249 | |
2010-05-27 | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled SJ-67 | |
2010-05-26 | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments HJ-12 | |
2010-05-25 | Read second time HJ-73 | |
2010-05-25 | Amended HJ-73 | |
2010-05-25 | Debate adjourned HJ-35 | |
2010-05-25 | Debate adjourned | |
2010-05-20 | Debate adjourned until Tuesday, May 25, 2010 HJ-20 | |
2010-05-20 | Amended HJ-20 | |
2010-05-12 | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary HJ-9 | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-9 | |
2009-03-26 | Introduced and read first time HJ-9 | |
2009-03-25 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-11 | |
2009-03-24 | Read second time SJ-27 | |
2009-03-24 | Amended SJ-27 | |
2009-03-11 | Committee report: Favorable Corrections and Penology SJ-15 | |
2009-01-28 | Referred to Committee on Corrections and Penology SJ-5 | |
2009-01-28 | Introduced and read first time SJ-5 |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=329&session=118 |