SC S242 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - Scrivener's error corrected
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - Scrivener's error corrected
Summary
A BILL TO CLOSE THE TEACHER AND EMPLOYEE RETENTION INCENTIVE (TERI) PROGRAM TO NEW PARTICIPANTS EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2009; TO REPEAL ARTICLE 17, CHAPTER 1, TITLE 9 OF THE 1976 CODE, RELATING TO THE ESTABLISHMENT OF THE TERI PROGRAM; AND TO PROVIDE THAT THE PROVISIONS OF THIS ACT MAY NOT BE AMENDED OR REPEALED EXCEPT IN SEPARATE LEGISLATION RECEIVING AN AFFIRMATIVE TWO-THIRDS RECORDED VOTE IN EACH HOUSE OF THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY.
Title
Relating To The Establishment Of The Teri Program; And To Provide That The Provisions Of This Act May Not Be Amended Or Repealed Except In Separate Legislation Receiving An Affirmative Two-thirds Recorded Vote In Each House Of The General Assembly.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Bright [R] | Sen. Kevin Bryant [R] | Sen. Thomas Davis [R] | Sen. Michael Fair [R] |
Sen. John Knotts [R] | Sen. Larry Martin [R] | Sen. William O'Dell [R] | Sen. Greg Ryberg [R] |
Sen. Danny Verdin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-04-14 | Committee report: Majority favorable with amend., minority unfavorable Finance SJ-58 | |
2009-01-14 | Referred to Subcommittee: Alexander (ch), Setzler, Ryberg, Verdin, Leventis, Jackson | |
2009-01-13 | Referred to Committee on Finance SJ-193 | |
2009-01-13 | Introduced and read first time SJ-193 |
Same As/Similar To
H3009 (Similar To) 2009-02-19 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Toole
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=0242&session=118 |