SC S1384 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-05 - Act No. 309
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-05 - Act No. 309
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reapportion The Five Specific Election Districts From Which Certain Members Of The Governing Body Of York County School District 1 Must Be Elected Beginning With School Trustee Elections In 2012, And To Provide For Demographic Information In Regard To These Newly Drawn Election Districts, And Make Necessary Conforming Changes
Title
York County School District 1
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-05 | Act No. 309 | |
2012-05-17 | Effective date 05/14/12 | |
2012-05-14 | Signed By Governor | |
2012-05-08 | Ratified R 180 | |
2012-04-19 | Read third time and enrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Roll call Yeas-53 Nays-0 | |
2012-04-18 | Read second time | |
2012-04-17 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference | |
2012-04-11 | Read third time and sent to House | |
2012-03-29 | Read second time | |
2012-03-28 | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |