SC S1381 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-28 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-18
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-28 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-18
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION TO DISAPPROVE REGULATIONS OF THE DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES, RELATING TO CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES, DESIGNATED AS REGULATION DOCUMENT NUMBER 4109, PURSUANT TO THE PROVISIONS OF ARTICLE 1, CHAPTER 23, TITLE 1 OF THE 1976 CODE.
Title
Disapprove Regulations Of The Department Of Social Services, Relating To Child Support Guidelines, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4109, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-18 | |
2010-04-28 | Introduced and read first time HJ-17 | |
2010-04-27 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-19 | |
2010-04-22 | Read second time SJ-22 | |
2010-04-21 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference SJ-4 |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=1381&session=118 |