SC S1341 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-02 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-02 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name South Carolina Highway 34 From The Bishopville City Limits To The Lee County/kershaw County Line As "governor Mcleod Highway" In Honor Of Former Governor Thomas Gordon Mcleod, And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Reflecting This Designation.
Title
Governor McLeod Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence |
2016-06-01 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 6-2-16 |
2016-05-31 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2016-05-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2016-05-31 | House | Introduced |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2016-05-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar without reference |