SC S1338 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 312
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 312
Summary
AN ACT TO AMEND ACT 432 OF 1947, AS AMENDED, RELATING TO THE GREENVILLE HOSPITAL SYSTEM, ITS CREATION, BOARD, POWERS, AND DUTIES, SO AS TO PROVIDE THAT THE GREENVILLE HOSPITAL SYSTEM BOARD OF TRUSTEES MAY ESTABLISH A POLICE DEPARTMENT, EMPLOY POLICE AND SECURITY OFFICERS, AND TO PROVIDE FOR THE POLICE DEPARTMENT'S DUTIES, RESPONSIBILITIES, POWERS, FUNCTIONS, AND JURISDICTION. - ratified title
Title
Provide That The Greenville Hospital System Board Of Trustees May Establish A Police Department, Employ Police And Security Officers, And To Provide For The Police Department's Duties, Responsibilities, Powers, Functions, And Jurisdiction. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-09 | Act No. 312 | |
2010-07-01 | Effective date 06/14/10 | |
2010-06-14 | Became law without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-07 | Ratified R 313 | |
2010-06-01 | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled SJ-149 | |
2010-05-27 | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments HJ-32 | |
2010-05-26 | Read second time HJ-5 | |
2010-05-26 | Amended HJ-5 | |
2010-05-25 | Debate adjourned until Wednesday, May 26, 2010 HJ-35 | |
2010-05-25 | Debate adjourned HJ-12 | |
2010-05-20 | Debate adjourned until Tuesday, May 25, 2010 HJ-11 | |
2010-05-18 | Delegation report: Favorable Greenville Delegation HJ-43 | |
2010-04-28 | Referred to Greenville Delegation HJ-15 | |
2010-04-28 | Introduced and read first time HJ-15 | |
2010-04-27 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-15 | |
2010-04-22 | Read second time SJ-19 | |
2010-04-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-03-31 | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar SJ-6 |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=1338&session=118 |