SC S1328 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-24 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-24 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating To Soil And Water Conservation District Commissioners And The Powers Of The Commissioners And The Districts, By Adding Section 48-9-1330 To Provide For An Exemption For Appointed Commissioners From Financial Disclosure Requirements Contained In Article 11, Chapter 13, Title 8.
Title
Soil and Water Conservation District Commissioners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-04-24 | Introduced and read first time | |
2012-04-19 | Read third time and sent to House | |
2012-04-18 | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-2 | |
2012-04-18 | Read second time | |
2012-04-17 | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2012-04-17 | Polled out of committee Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2012-03-14 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2012-03-14 | Introduced and read first time |