SC S1321 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-07 - Conference committee appointed Campsen, Malloy, and Rose
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-07 - Conference committee appointed Campsen, Malloy, and Rose
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That For A Third Or Subsequent Offense, The Person Must Be Fined One Thousand Dollars, And Imprisoned For Up To Ninety Days Or Confined To The Person's Place Of Residence Pursuant To The Home Detention Act For Up To Ninety Days.
Title
Amendment to the Omnibus Crime Reduction and Sentencing Reform Act
Sponsors
Sen. George Campsen [R] | Sen. Robert Ford [D] | Sen. John Knotts [R] | Sen. Gerald Malloy [D] |
Sen. Glenn McConnell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-07 | Conference committee appointed Campsen, Malloy, and Rose | |
2012-06-07 | House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Bannister, Tallon, and Rutherford | |
2012-06-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2012-06-07 | Roll call Ayes-0 Nays-39 | |
2012-06-07 | Non-concurrence in House amendment | |
2012-06-07 | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments | |
2012-06-06 | Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-3 | |
2012-06-06 | Read second time | |
2012-06-06 | Amended | |
2012-06-05 | Requests for debate-Rep | |
2012-05-30 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary | |
2012-04-24 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-04-24 | Introduced and read first time | |
2012-04-19 | Read third time and sent to House | |
2012-04-17 | Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-0 | |
2012-04-17 | Read second time | |
2012-03-21 | Committee report: Favorable Finance | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Ford, Knotts, Campsen | |
2012-03-07 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-07 | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 11 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 11 | 312 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 23 | 500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 3 | 560 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 5 | 920 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 19 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 21 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 21 | 280 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 21 | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 53 | 370 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 53 | 375 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 53 | 470 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 396 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 460 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 2945 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 2990 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |