SC S1305 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-08 - Act No. 319
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-08 - Act No. 319
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Department Of Natural Resources, Relating To Seasons, Limits, Methods Of Take And Special Use Restrictions On Wildlife Management Areas, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4443, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code
Title
Seasons, Limits, Methods or take and special use restrictions on wildlife management areas (D. No. 4443)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-29 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-08 | Act No. 319 | |
2014-06-18 | Effective date 06/12/14 | |
2014-06-11 | Became law without Governor's signature | |
2014-06-05 | Ratified R 287 | |
2014-05-30 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2014-05-29 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2014-05-29 | House | Roll call Yeas-93 Nays-0 |
2014-05-29 | House | Read second time |
2014-05-27 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-1 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |