SC S1285 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-23 - Act No. 235
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-23 - Act No. 235
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Act 259 Of 1961, Relating To The Hartsville Community Center Building Commission, So As To Increase The Commission's Membership From Three To Five Members And To Delete References To Initial Board Members. - Ratified Title
Title
Hartsville Center Theater
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-23 | Act No. 235 | |
2024-05-20 | Effective date 05/13/24 | |
2024-05-13 | Signed By Governor | |
2024-05-08 | Ratified R 138 | |
2024-05-03 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2024-05-02 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2024-05-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 |
2024-05-02 | House | Read second time |
2024-05-01 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
2024-05-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |