SC S1270 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Department Of Health And Environmental Control, Relating To Access Of Restricted Information Pursuant To The State's Freedom Of Information Act, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4197, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code.
Title
Access of restricted information pursuant to FOIA (D. No. 4197)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced and read first time | |
2012-03-08 | Read third time and sent to House | |
2012-03-07 | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 | |
2012-03-07 | Read second time | |
2012-02-29 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |