SC S1263 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Act No. 153
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 7-7-340, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Designation Of Voting Precincts In Kershaw County, So As To Merge The East Camden-hermitage Precinct With The Camden 6 Precinct, With The Resulting Combined Precinct Retaining The Name Camden 6, To Merge The Gates Ford Precinct With The Buffalo Precinct, With The Resulting Combined Precinct Retaining The Name Buffalo, And To Update The Map Number On Which The Names Of These Precincts May Be Found And Maintained By The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kershaw County; Voting precincts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 21) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-02 Act No. 153
2020-10-02 Effective date 09/28/20
2020-09-28 Signed By Governor
2020-09-25 Ratified R 169
2020-09-23HouseRead third time and enrolled
2020-09-22HouseRoll call Yeas-99 Nays-0
2020-09-22HouseRead second time
2020-09-15HouseIntroduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
2020-09-15SenateRead third time and sent to House
2020-09-03SenateRead second time
2020-09-02SenateUnanimous consent for second reading on next legislative day
2020-09-02SenateIntroduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
77340(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback