SC S1256 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-13 - Continued
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-13 - Continued
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reapportion The Specific Election Districts From Which Members Of The Bamberg-ehrhardt School District One Must Be Elected, And To Provide For Demographic Information In Regard To These Newly Drawn Election Districts.
Title
Denmark-Olar School District One
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 43) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-13 | House | Continued |
2014-05-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-76 Nays-0 |
2014-05-08 | House | Read second time |
2014-05-07 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |