SC S1243 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-18 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-18 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That The Department Of Motor Vehicles May Issue "chase Away Childhood Cancer" Special License Plates.
Title
Special license plates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-11 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2016-05-18 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-04-29 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Transportation |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |