SC S1237 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Act No. 216
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Act No. 216
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Article 142, Chapter 3, Title 56, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Issuance Of "university Of South Carolina 2017 Women's Basketball National Champions" Special License Plates By The Department Of Motor Vehicles, So As To Also Provide For The Issuance Of "university Of South Carolina 2022 Women's Basketball National Champions" Special License Plates By The Department; To Amend Section 56-3-14970, Relating To The Issuance Of Certain Military Service Special License Plates, So As To Provide For The Issuance Of "us Space Force" Special License Plates; To Amend Section 56-3-14940, Relating To The Issuance Of Service-connected Disability Special License Plates, So As To Exempt These License Plates From The Regular Motor Vehicle Registration Fee, And Provide For Refunds Of Certain Registration Fees; To Amend Section 56-3-14960, Relating To The Issuance Of Meritorious Service Special License Plates, So As To Provide For The Issuance Of "meritorious Service Medal" Special License Plates; To Amend Section 56-3-14980, Relating To The Issuance Of Special License Plates Showing Support For Military-related Private Organizations, So As To Provide For The Issuance Of "support Our Troops" Special License Plates; To Amend Section 56-3-14990, Relating To Surviving Spouses Obtaining Certain Special License Plates Issued To Their Deceased Spouses, So As To Revise The Special License Plates Subject To This Provision; To Amend Section 56-3-15000, Relating To License Plates Issued Under Previous Award Criteria, So As To Make Technical Changes; And To Repeal Article 20, Chapter 3, Title 56 Relating To Special License Plates Issued To Members Of Foreign Consulates. - Ratified Title
Title
USC 2022 Women's Basketball National Champions Special License Plates
Sponsors
Sen. Maymia McLeod [D] | Sen. Margie Matthews [D] | Sen. Katrina Shealy [R] | Sen. Sandra Senn [R] |
Sen. Penry Gustafson [R] | Sen. Gerald Malloy [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Act No. 216 | |
2022-06-01 | Effective date See Act for Effective Date | |
2022-05-23 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-05-18 | Ratified R 244 | |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2022-05-11 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2022-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-0 |
2022-05-10 | House | Read second time |
2022-05-10 | House | Amended |
2022-05-05 | House | Debate adjourned |
2022-05-04 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2022-04-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2022-04-19 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-04-08 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Amended |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
56 | 3 | 14940 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 14960 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 14970 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 14980 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 14990 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 15000 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |