SC S1234 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-03 - Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments HJ-21
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-03 - Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments HJ-21
Summary
A BILL TO ESTABLISH A STUDY COMMITTEE TO STUDY AND DEVELOP A PLAN TO CONSOLIDATE THE FUNCTIONS OF THE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND THE DEPARTMENT OF PROBATION, PAROLE AND PARDON SERVICES, TO PROVIDE FOR THE STUDY COMMITTEE’S MEMBERSHIP, AND TO PROVIDE FOR THE STUDY COMMITTEE’S DUTIES AND RESPONSIBILITIES.
Title
A Bill To Establish A Study Committee To Study And Develop A Plan To Consolidate The Functions Of The Department Of Corrections And The Department Of Probation, Parole And Pardon Services, To Provide For The Study Committee’s Membership, And To Provide For The Study Committee’s Duties And Responsibilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-03 | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments HJ-21 | |
2010-06-02 | Read second time HJ-81 | |
2010-06-02 | Amended HJ-81 | |
2010-06-02 | Reconsidered HJ-81 | |
2010-06-02 | Read second time HJ-7 | |
2010-06-02 | Amended HJ-7 | |
2010-05-27 | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary HJ-42 | |
2010-04-27 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-28 | |
2010-04-27 | Introduced and read first time HJ-28 | |
2010-04-22 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-17 | |
2010-04-21 | Read second time SJ-33 | |
2010-04-21 | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted SJ-33 | |
2010-04-20 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Corrections and Penology SJ-8 | |
2010-03-02 | Referred to Committee on Corrections and Penology SJ-11 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced and read first time SJ-11 |
Same As/Similar To
H4826 (Similar To) 2010-04-14 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-15
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=1234&session=118 |