SC S1233 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-22 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-22 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Intersection Located At The Junction Of United States Highway 178 And United States Highway 78 In Dorchester County "george Bailey Interchange" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Location Containing These Words.
Title
George Bailey Interchange
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence |
2020-09-15 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2020-06-24 | House | Introduced |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Introduced, adopted, sent to House |