SC S1231 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Introduced and adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Introduced and adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorize Palmetto Boys State To Use The Chambers Of The South Carolina Senate For Its Annual State House Meeting On Friday, June 17, 2022, From 11:30 A.m. To 1:00 P.m. However, The Chambers May Not Be Used If The Senate Is In Session Or The Chambers Are Otherwise Unavailable.
Title
Boys State Use of Chamber
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Introduced and adopted |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Operations and Management |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Polled out of committee Operations and Management |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Operations and Management |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced |