SC S1229 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - Adopted, sent to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - Adopted, sent to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of United States Highway 321 In Richland County From Its Intersection With Friendly Woods Road To Its Intersection With Blythewood Road "pastor Eddie W. Davis Highway" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Highway That Contain This Designation.
Title
Pastor Eddie W. Davis highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2016-05-05 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2016-04-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2016-04-28 | House | Introduced |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2016-04-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2016-04-18 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Introduced |