SC S1218 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Effective date 05/18/18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Alter The Method Of Appointing Members To The Board Of Directors

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lancaster County Natural Gas Authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24 Effective date 05/18/18
2018-05-18 Signed By Governor
2018-05-14 Ratified R 232
2018-05-10HouseRead third time and enrolled
2018-05-09HouseRoll call Yeas-100 Nays-0
2018-05-09HouseRead second time
2018-05-09 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-05-08HouseIntroduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
2018-05-04SenateRead third time and sent to House
2018-05-03SenateUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2018-05-03SenateRead second time
2018-05-03 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-05-02SenateIntroduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback