SC S1206 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Act No. 292
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Act No. 292
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Direct The State Department Of Education To Rename The Greenville State Bus Shop On Halton Road In Greenville County To Be The "joe Madden Bus Center"
Title
Joe Madden Bus Center
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-24 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 46) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-14 | Act No. 292 | |
2016-06-09 | Effective date 06/03/16 | |
2016-06-03 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-06-02 | Ratified R 243 | |
2016-05-25 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2016-05-24 | House | Roll call Yeas-69 Nays-1 |
2016-05-24 | House | Read second time |
2016-05-19 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2016-04-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2016-04-21 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Amended |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Education |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |