SC S1191 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Fix Eleven O'clock On Thursday, May 10, 2018, As The Time To Elect A Member Of The Public Service Commission For The Second Congressional District For A Term Expiring On June 30, 2022; To Elect A Member Of The Public Service Commission For The Fourth Congressional District For A Term Expiring On June 30, 2022; To Elect A Member Of The Public Service Commission For The Sixth Congressional District For A Term Expiring On June 30, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election of Public Service Commission Members

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26HouseIntroduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
2018-04-25SenateAdopted, sent to House
2018-04-24SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar without reference

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback