SC S1191 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - Roll call Yeas-85 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - Roll call Yeas-85 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Disapprove Amendments To The South Carolina Rules Of Criminal Procedure, As Promulgated By The Supreme Court Of South Carolina And Submitted To The General Assembly Pursuant To Section 4a, Article V Of The Constitution Of This State.
Title
S.C Rules of Criminal Procedure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-26 - House - House: Adopt Concurrent Resolution (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-85 Nays-0 |
2016-04-26 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2016-04-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Introduced |