SC S1190 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Effective date 05/17/18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Effective date 05/17/18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Direct The Department Of Health And Environmental Control To Focus The Resources Of The Department's Dams And Reservoirs Safety Program On Regulating The State's High And Significant Hazard Dams
Title
DHEC, Dam and Reservoirs Safety Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 101 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | Effective date 05/17/18 | |
2018-05-17 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 231 | |
2018-05-10 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2018-05-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-3 |
2018-05-09 | House | Read second time |
2018-05-03 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Amended |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |