SC S1190 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 319
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 319
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION TO MAKE CERTAIN FINDINGS BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY IN REGARD TO THE SETTLEMENT OF LITIGATION INVOLVING A SITE ACQUIRED BY THE STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA IN RICHLAND COUNTY FOR THE PROPOSED STATE FARMERS' MARKET, AND TO CONFIRM AND VALIDATE THE USE OF SPECIFIC TRACTS OF LAND RECEIVED BY THE SOUTH CAROLINA RESEARCH AUTHORITY, AND RICHLAND COUNTY AS PART OF THE SETTLEMENT, AND THE USE OF CERTAIN REVENUES TO MEET OBLIGATIONS CONTINUING UNDER THE SETTLEMENT. - ratified title
Title
Make Certain Findings By The General Assembly In Regard To The Settlement Of Litigation Involving A Site Acquired By The State Of South Carolina In Richland County For The Proposed State Farmers' Market, And To Confirm And Validate The Use Of Specific Tracts Of Land Received By The South Carolina Research Authority, And Richland County As Part Of The Settlement, And The Use Of Certain Revenues To Meet Obligations Continuing Under The Settlement. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-09 | Act No. 319 | |
2010-07-13 | Effective date 06/16/10 | |
2010-06-16 | Veto overridden Yeas-85 Nays-19 HJ-10 | |
2010-06-16 | Reconsidered HJ-8 | |
2010-06-15 | Motion noted- Rep. Jennings noted a motion to reconsider the vote whereby the Veto was sustained | |
2010-06-15 | Veto sustained Yeas-50 Nays-51 HJ-69 | |
2010-06-03 | Debate adjourned on Governor's veto HJ-49 | |
2010-06-02 | Veto overridden by originating body Yeas-26 Nays-13 SJ-183 | |
2010-05-28 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Ratified R 227 | |
2010-05-21 | Read third time and enrolled HJ-1 | |
2010-05-20 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day HJ-17 | |
2010-05-20 | Read second time HJ-16 | |
2010-05-19 | Debate adjourned until Thursday, May 20, 2010 HJ-26 | |
2010-05-12 | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary HJ-8 | |
2010-04-15 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-31 | |
2010-04-15 | Introduced and read first time HJ-31 | |
2010-04-14 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-72 | |
2010-04-14 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-04-13 | Read second time SJ-22 | |
2010-04-13 | Committee Amendment Adopted SJ-22 | |
2010-03-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-03-03 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance SJ-14 | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to Committee on Finance SJ-8 | |
2010-02-17 | Introduced and read first time SJ-8 |
Same As/Similar To
H4506 (Similar To) 2010-06-03 - Amended SJ-35
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=1190&session=118 |