SC S1183 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-06 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-06 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That All Other Funds Collected By An Agency Must Be Deposited In The General Fund And Must Be Considered General Funds, To Provide For Definitions, And To Specify The Applicability Of This Section.
Title
Other funds collected by agency to be deposited in the general fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-06 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2012-06-06 | Introduced and read first time | |
2012-06-05 | Read third time and sent to House | |
2012-05-31 | Roll call Ayes-35 Nays-0 | |
2012-05-31 | Read second time | |
2012-05-30 | Committee report: Favorable Finance | |
2012-02-07 | Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-02-07 | Introduced and read first time |