SC S1179 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - Referred to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures
Pending: House Regulations and Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - Referred to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures
Pending: House Regulations and Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Department Of Natural Resources, Relating To Wildlife Management Area Regulations; And Turkey Hunting Rules And Seasons, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4635, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code.
Title
Wildlife management area regulations; turkey hunting rules and seasons (D. No. 4635)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures |
2016-04-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-35 Nays-1 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |