SC S1137 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-17 - Act No. 280
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-17 - Act No. 280
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Enact The "architects' And Engineers' Volunteer Act" Which Provides Specified Immunity For A Registered Architect Or Engineer Who Provides Certain Voluntary Architectural Or Engineering Services At The Scene Of A Declared State Or National Emergency At The Request Of The Governor, To Provide Exceptions To This Immunity, And To Provide The Conditions And Circumstances Under Which This Grant Of Immunity Is Applicable
Title
Architects and Engineers Volunteer Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-17 | Act No. 280 | |
2012-07-17 | Effective date 06/26/12 | |
2012-06-26 | Signed By Governor | |
2012-06-22 | Ratified R 314 | |
2012-06-19 | Ordered enrolled for ratification | |
2012-06-19 | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 | |
2012-06-19 | Conference report received and adopted | |
2012-06-19 | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 | |
2012-06-19 | Conference report adopted | |
2012-06-07 | Conference committee appointed Reese, Bryant, and Shoopman | |
2012-06-07 | House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Sandifer, Anderson, Bingham | |
2012-06-06 | Roll call Ayes-2 Nays-42 | |
2012-06-06 | Non-concurrence in House amendment | |
2012-05-31 | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments | |
2012-05-30 | Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0 | |
2012-05-30 | Read second time | |
2012-05-30 | Amended | |
2012-05-24 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry | |
2012-04-25 | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry | |
2012-04-25 | Introduced and read first time | |
2012-04-24 | Read third time and sent to House | |
2012-04-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2012-04-19 | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 | |
2012-04-19 | Read second time | |
2012-04-19 | Committee Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-21 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry | |
2012-01-24 | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry | |
2012-01-24 | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4745 (Similar To) 2012-02-08 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry