SC S1136 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Change The Age For Which The General Assembly Shall Provide For The Separate Confinement Of Juvenile Offenders From "under The Age Of Seventeen" To "under The Age Of Eighteen".
Title
Confinement for juveniles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-03-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Campsen, Hembree |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |