SC S1128 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorize The Executive Director Of The Office Of Regulatory Staff To File An Action In Circuit Court To Require The Production Of Documents Or Witnesses In Certain Circumstances If An Entity Has Provided Goods Or Services To A Utility For The Design, Construction, Or Operation Of A Facility That Has Been The Subject Of A Proceeding Concerning The Base Load Review Act; To Provide That The Only Relief The Court May Order Is For The Production Of Documents, Requiring The Appearance Of Witnesses, Allowing The Office Of Regulatory Staff To Take Depositions, Or A Combination Thereof; To Require The Action To Be Heard As And Decided As Expeditiously As Consistent With Due Process; And To Provide For Penalties For Failure To Comply With A Court Order Issued Pursuant To This Joint Resolution.
Title
Base Load Review Act
Sponsors
Sen. Luke Rankin [R] | Sen. Bradley Hutto [D] | Sen. Shane Massey [R] | Sen. Thomas McElveen [D] |
Sen. Ronnie Sabb [D] | Sen. Michael Gambrell [R] | Sen. Wes Climer [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2018-04-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2018-03-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |