SC S1127 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Delete The Provision That The Exemption Applies Only To The Extent That Is Permitted In Section 522(d) Of The Federal Bankruptcy Code.
Title
IRA exempt from attachment, levy and sale
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-28 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-2 |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-04-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Gregory (ch), Malloy, Turner |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |