SC S1121 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-09 - Act No. 184
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-09 - Act No. 184
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Consolidate Hampton County School District No. 1 And Hampton County School District No. 2 Into One School District To Be Known As The Hampton County School District; To Abolish Hampton County School District No. 1 And Hampton County School District No. 2 On July 1, 2021; To Provide That The Hampton County School District Must Be Governed Initially By A Board Of Trustees Consisting Of Nine Members, Which Must Be Appointed By The Hampton County Legislative Delegation; To Provide That Beginning In 2022, The Initial Nine-member Appointed Board Shall Begin The Process Of Transitioning To A Seven-member Elected Board Of Trustees By Electing Four Members To Serve Four-year Terms From Single-member Election Districts 1, 3, 5, And 7 In Nonpartisan Elections To Be Conducted At The Same Time As The 2022 General Election; To Establish Continuity Of Leadership Provisions By Requiring The Hampton County Legislative Delegation To Select Three Members From The Initial Nine-member Appointed Board To Serve Alongside The Four Members Elected In 2022 Until The Three Appointed Members' Successors Are Elected To Serve Four-year Terms From Single-member Election Districts 2, 4, And 6 In Nonpartisan Elections To Be Conducted At The Same Time As The 2024 General Election, And, Thereafter, To Provide That Members Of The Hampton County School District Board Of Trustees Must Be Elected In Nonpartisan School District Elections To Be Conducted At The Same Time As The General Election For Terms Of Four Years And Until Their Successors Are Elected And Qualify; To Establish The Board's Powers, Duties, And Responsibilities; To Provide That The District Superintendent Is The Chief Operating Officer Of The District And Is Responsible To The Board For The Proper Administration Of All Affairs Of The District And Subject To All Other Provisions Of Law Relating To His Duties; To Include Interim Millage Provisions For Years 2021, 2022, 2023, And 2024, And To Provide That Beginning In 2025, The Hampton County School District Is Authorized To Approve An Annual Tax Levy In Order To Obtain Funds For School Purposes As Provided In This Act; To Transfer The Assets And Liabilities Of Hampton County School District No. 1 And Hampton County School District No. 2 To The Hampton County School District On July 1, 2021; And To Repeal All Local Acts Inconsistent With The Provisions Of This Act. - Ratified Title
Title
Hampton County School Districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-09 | Act No. 184 | |
2020-10-07 | Effective date 10/28/20 | |
2020-09-28 | Signed By Governor | |
2020-09-25 | Ratified R 167 | |
2020-09-23 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2020-09-22 | House | Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-0 |
2020-09-22 | House | Read second time |
2020-09-22 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-09-16 | House | Delegation report: Favorable Hampton Delegation |
2020-09-15 | House | Referred to Hampton Delegation |
2020-09-15 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Amended |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |